Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural Purposes
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of an all-terrain or utility-terrain vehicle when purchased by a farmer and used exclusively for an agricultural purpose on the farmer's property.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1112
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural Purposes
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM