Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Eminent Domain - Broadband Services
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the damages to be awarded for a certain taking of land or an interest in land subject to a utility easement where that easement is being used for providing broadband telecommunication services; requiring certain damages to be computed at the time of taking and shall not accrue over time; prohibiting certain evidence of revenues or profits from being used for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1310
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Eminent Domain - Broadband Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Eminent Domain - Broadband Services
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM