Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a single, uniform pay plan for teachers and professional personnel at the Maryland School for the Blind; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to establish the pay plan after considering recommendations by the Board of Directors of the School; requiring the Board to review certain salaries in determining the pay plan recommendations; requiring the Board to submit the recommendations to the Secretary by June 1 prior to the July 1 of the first fiscal year in which the pay plan will take effect; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1054
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Pay Plan
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Last Updated: 3/6/2021 11:25 AM
Click to return on the top page