Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Ferguson, Forehand, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Raskin, Simonaire, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that engaging in sexual contact with another without the consent of the other in connection with a first, second, or third degree burglary constitutes sexual offense in the third degree; altering the definitions of "tier I sex offender", "tier II sex offender", and "tier III sex offender" applicable to provisions relating to sex offender registration to include specified acts constituting sexual offense in the third degree; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0985
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0642 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM