Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a police officer who has reasonable grounds to believe that an individual has been driving or attempting to drive while under the influence or while impaired by alcohol, drugs, or controlled dangerous substances in violation of certain laws to provide certain medical personnel with a certain signed statement; and requiring medical personnel, on receipt of a signed statement from a police officer, to perform a certain test regardless of whether the person to be tested consents to the test.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1205
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing Requirement
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   16-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page