Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bladensburg Road Economic Development Project
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and Town Council of the Town of Colmar Manor for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Bladensburg Road Economic Development Project, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0213
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0668 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM