Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Information Technology and Cybersecurity Qualifications - Established (Maryland State IT Hiring Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in partnership with the Secretary of Information Technology and the State Chief Information Security Officer, to establish certain minimum qualifications for skilled service and professional service classes of State employees in the information technology and cybersecurity fields; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to revise the standards for position selection plans for certain classifications of State employees in certain fields by January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Personnel - Information Technology and Cybersecurity Qualifications - Established (Maryland State IT Hiring Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:18 PM