Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a school principal to make a report to a law enforcement agency if, after an investigation is completed, the principal has reason to believe that a student has engaged in conduct that constitutes a certain criminal offense; requiring certain school policies prohibiting bullying, harassment, or intimidation to include procedures for providing notice of an act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation to a parent or guardian of the alleged victim and of the alleged perpetrator within 5 days after the act is reported; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {428777/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {992116/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (130-6)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation - Civil Relief and School Response
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 19
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {428777/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation - Civil Relief and School Response
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {992116/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (130-6) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text - Chapter - Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-303.1, 7-424, 7-424.1, 7-424.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM