Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a holder of a tax sale certificate may be reimbursed a certain amount for attorney's fees if an action to foreclose the right of redemption on certain property has not been filed, and if an action to foreclose the right of redemption on certain property has been filed; providing that a holder of a tax sale certificate may be reimbursed for certain costs for verifying if a defendant is in the armed services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1292
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM