Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Feldman, King, Manno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified county boards of education receive the Geographic Cost of Education Index adjustment; repealing specified provisions that phased in a specified adjustment in specified fiscal years and allowed for the reduction of a specified adjustment under specified circumstances; establishing a specified amount of capital funding for the public school construction or capital improvement program in specified fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM