Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Middleton, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Maryland Clean Energy Center; requiring the Task Force to assess specified programs, review specified State financing instrumentalities, identify specified resources, review specified cost-effective opportunities, and make specified determinations; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747874/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133197/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-27)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {747874/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {133197/1 Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-27) 71
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM