Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions
Sponsored by
Senators DeGrange, Garagiola, Robey, King, Currie, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the credit against the State income tax for qualified electric vehicle recharging equipment for specified tax years; providing for the amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued by the Maryland Energy Administration; establishing that the credit is subject to available funding; transferring money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund for fiscal 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0791
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1002 )
(   9-20B-05 )
(   10-729 )
(   13-815 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM