Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background Checks
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Brinkley, Colburn, Getty, Glassman, and Kittleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, before October 1, 2016, a licensed firearm dealer to conditionally sell, rent, or transfer a firearm to a firearm applicant under specified circumstances; prohibiting the licensee from selling, renting, or transferring the firearm under specified circumstances; requiring the licensee to make specified notifications under specified circumstances; authorizing a law enforcement agency to confiscate a specified firearm under specified circumstances; and terminating the Act at the end of September 30, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM