Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Edwards, Eckardt, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a record owner of a specified new dwelling in a specified county to claim a credit against the State income tax in an amount equal to $1.25 for each square foot of the new dwelling if a specified automatic fire sprinkler system is installed in the new dwelling; requiring the Office of the State Fire Marshal to approve applications for the credit; providing that the Office may not approve a credit in a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2018; limiting the total amount of credits to $1,000,000 in any taxable year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {719030/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {719030/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM