Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of Election
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which the County Commissioners of Calvert County are elected beginning with the November 2014 general election; requiring that specified county commissioners be residents of and represent specified election districts; requiring that other county commissioners be residents of the county and represent the county at large; requiring that each candidate for the office of county commissioner specify when filing a certificate of candidacy specified information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (37-84)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {833220/1 Rejected (38-89)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {423927/1 Rejected (49-88)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {123623/1 Rejected (43-93)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-45)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 49
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (37-84) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {833220/1 Rejected (38-89) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {423927/1 Rejected (49-88) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {123623/1 Rejected (43-93) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (93-45) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM