Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a motor vehicle dealer's failure to comply with a manufacturer's or distributor's specific requirements for processing a claim constitutes grounds for denial of a claim or reduction of the amount of compensation; prohibiting a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from taking specified action against a dealer who provides to a customer information given to the dealer by a manufacturer related to any conditions affecting motor vehicle safety, durability, reliability, or performance; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0525
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498172/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {853625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {498172/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {853625/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-212, 15-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM