Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Kramer, Lam, Peters, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the pay ranges for certain employee position classifications to be equal; providing that a certain provision of law may not be construed to decrease the pay rate of any employee; and requiring that the pay rate for a certain employee in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be at least two grades higher than a pay rate effective June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1240
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM