Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 33% to 38% the percentage of the proceeds from video lottery terminals at the Cecil County facility that are paid to the video lottery operation licensee of the facility; requiring that 2% of the proceeds from video lottery terminals at the facility be spent on specified marketing, advertising, and promotion costs and capital improvements at the video lottery facility as a condition of receiving additional proceeds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0761
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM