Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protecting Maryland Taxpayers Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that an amendment to the Internal Revenue Code be enacted during the calendar year in which the taxable year that the amendment affects begins in order for the amendment not to impact the determination of Maryland taxable income; allowing an individual to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income whether or not the individual itemizes deductions on the individual's federal tax return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0875
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protecting Maryland Taxpayers Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Protecting Maryland Taxpayers Act of 2018
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-108, 10-217, 10-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM