Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to provide a certain list of digital tools to the State Department of Education on or before July 1 each year; requiring the Department to publish certain information on digital tools provided by each county board on or before September 1 each year; requiring the Student Data Privacy Council to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024; and extending the termination date for the Council to September 30, 2025.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page