Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program and Fund; specifying the purposes of both the Program and the Fund; requiring the Maryland Biotechnology Center in the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; establishing criteria and award amounts for grants awarded under the Program; requiring recipients of Program funds to pay a royalty; requiring the Governor to make a specified appropriation beginning in fiscal year 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0708 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1401 through 5-1406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM