Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Public Defender to investigate the financial status of each applicant for services; requiring the Office to require a specified applicant to execute and deliver specified requests or authorizations that are needed in order to evaluate eligibility for services of the Office; requiring the Office to submit specified requests to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation for information regarding the employment status and income of applicants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858274/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858274/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {858274/1 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Favorable with Amendments {858274/1 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 51
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM