Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of County Commissioners of St. Mary's County, when the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission plans to borrow any money, to review and approve any loan application before the Commission submits the loan application to a lender.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790715/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {684330/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {790715/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page