Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to borrow not more than $26,300,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in St. Mary's County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {779334/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {779334/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM