Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Eckardt, Hershey, Manno, Mathias, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Rural Economic Development Program to encourage businesses to locate and expand in the rural counties of the State; providing that for 10 taxable years after a business is designated as a qualified business under the Program the business is eligible for a specified property tax exemption, income tax subtraction modification, and sales and use tax exemption; establishing the Rural Economic Development Program Infrastructure Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to be used to make grants to specified counties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 5-1501 through 5-1503, 6-401 )
(   10-207, 10-307, 11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM