Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified limits on debt in St. Mary's County; subjecting specified bonds and other evidences of indebtedness issued under the authority of the St. Mary's County Sanitary Commission Act to a specified limitation; and requiring the responsibility for repayment to remain with the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1055
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {813225/1 (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {219231/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Waugh) Adopted 45
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Waugh) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {813225/1 (Senator Waugh) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Appropriations 52
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   113-6, 27-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM