Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Sustainable Maryland Program Fund to expand and enhance Sustainable Maryland's promotion and support of communities in the State in the effort to realize environmental, economic, and social sustainability; specifying that the Fund may be used for educating communities in the development of strategies to achieve green community certification; requiring, beginning with fiscal year 2022, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $750,000 to the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {984533/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Appropriations 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-105 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM