Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law concerning the appointment and compensation of a law clerk for the St. Mary's County Circuit Court resident judge; and repealing specified provisions of law concerning the appointment and compensation of secretaries for judges in the Circuit Court for St. Mary's County.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0700
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1, 19-2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM