Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil Testing
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified person to forward the results of a specified soil test to the Department of Agriculture every five years in accordance with a specified schedule; requiring the Department to maintain a specified database that is searchable in a specified manner; requiring a specified database to protect the identity of specified persons and to be made available to the public on request; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154535/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154535/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {154535/1 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {154535/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 52
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-803.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM