Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Bates, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the integrated community oncology reporting program; establishing the purpose of the program; requiring the program to be administered by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Maryland Health Care Commission; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Commission, to adopt regulations to implement the program; establishing requirements for the regulations; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1422
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-302, 1-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM