Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of Israel
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin, Brochin, Conway, DeGrange, Feldman, Jennings, Kagan, Madaleno, Peters, Serafini, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of the State procurement law relating to the debarment of specified persons engaged in investment activities in Iran to include persons participating in a boycott of the State of Israel; and altering specified provisions of law requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to take divestment action with regard to investments in a company doing business in Iran or Sudan to include a company participating in a boycott of Israel.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0949
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of Israel
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-701, 17-702, 17-703 through 17-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM