Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person issued a specified license from possessing, providing, distributing, displaying, selling, or marketing a specified synthetic drug with the intent that it be used as a recreational drug; providing specified factors to be treated as indicia that a product is a specified synthetic drug; providing that specified proof is prima facie evidence of a violation of the Act; requiring that a specified person must permit the Comptroller to inspect specified records and products; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0881
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-20B-01 through 17-20B-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM