Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; authorizing a nonpublic school that participates in the federal School Breakfast Program or the National School Lunch Program to participate in the State Free Feeding Program; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing a county board of education or a nonpublic school for certain portions of the student share of the costs of certain meals in certain fiscal years; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0360 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {809437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175167/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-21)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text - First - State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {809437/1 Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {175167/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (114-21) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-601 through 7-605, 7-701 through 7-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page