Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person is entitled to expungement of an invalidated arrest warrant for the person's arrest and associated police records; authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement no earlier than 10 years after the person was convicted of a misdemeanor; prohibiting the filing of a petition for expungement based on a probation before judgment earlier than the date the petitioner was discharged from probation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103.2, 10-105, 10-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM