Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Lee, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the types of beverages that a restaurant may include in the price of a children's menu of meal options or a meal that is represented as a child's meal; and authorizing a restaurant to offer specified beverages to minors for a charge.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1090
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-304.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM