Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Astle, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Reilly, Simonaire, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from February 2019 to February 2021 the month after which the Comptroller is required to begin withholding from certain quarterly income tax distributions certain amounts owed by certain local governments to the Local Reserve Account; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0686
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 55
Post Passage 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2015, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM