Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Raskin, Feldman, and Kelley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, under specified circumstances, to make a new certificate of birth for an individual whose sex has been changed or who has been diagnosed with an intersex condition; requiring that a specified sex designation and, under specified circumstances, a specified name be on the new certificate of birth; prohibiting a new certificate of birth from having specified markings or showing on its face specified changes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0862
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337473/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337473/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337473/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Reilly) Adopted (24-19)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337473/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-26)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {813427/1 Rejected (15-29)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {203626/1 Rejected (13-30)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {893829/2 Rejected (14-30)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {143424/1 Rejected (15-29)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-49)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {337473/1 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {337473/1 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Ready) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {337473/1 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Reilly) Adopted (24-19) 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {337473/1 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-26) 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {813427/1 Rejected (15-29) 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {203626/1 Rejected (13-30) 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {893829/2 Rejected (14-30) 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {143424/1 Rejected (15-29) 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (91-49) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 484
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/23/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Serafini) {143424/01 Rejected
3/23/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Reilly) {203626/01 Rejected
3/23/2015 Amendments Senate - (Finance) {337473/01 Adopted
3/23/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Reilly) {813427/01 Rejected
3/23/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Ready) {893829/02 Rejected
2/13/2015 Text - First - Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
3/24/2015 Text - Third - Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
6/15/2015 Text - Chapter - Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Sex Change or Diagnosis of an Intersex Condition
3/18/2015 Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
4/06/2015 Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
3/20/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Reilly) Adopted (24-19) - 03/20/15
3/20/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Ready) Rejected (18-26) - 03/20/15
3/20/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {813427/1 Rejected (15-29) - 03/20/15
3/20/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {203626/1 Rejected (13-30) - 03/20/15
3/20/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {893829/2 Rejected (14-30) - 03/20/15
3/20/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Serafini) {143424/1 Rejected (15-29) - 03/20/15
3/21/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-16) - 03/21/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-49) - 04/02/15
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201, 4-211, 4-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM