Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Kagan, King, Lam, Lee, Rosapepe, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract includes a clause regarding notice of ownership of, investment in, or control of the election service provider by a foreign national; authorizing the State Administrator of Elections to terminate the contract with an election service provider on the making of a certain determination; requiring the Administrator to provide notice in writing of the termination and the reasons for terminating the contract; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {895662/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-29)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Ways and Means 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {895662/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (104-29) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
(   2-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page