Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer Park
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and King
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to provide that specified grants for the Water Park at Bohrer Park may not terminate before June 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0925
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-9)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Appropriations 38
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (126-9) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM