Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing a method of electing judges to the circuit court on a nonpartisan basis, without regard to political party affiliation; establishing a primary election for candidates for nomination for a circuit court judgeship to be administered in a specified manner under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-301, 5-703, 5-703.1, 5-706, 8-901 through 8-905, 9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM