Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the duration of a step therapy or fail-first protocol imposed by a specified insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization; requiring the insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization to allow a prescriber of a covered prescription drug or device to have access to a process to override the step therapy or fail-first protocol; requiring the override process to allow a prescriber to override the step therapy or fail-first protocol under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1015
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-140 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM