Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Correctional Facilities - Mental Disorder Screening
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and the Maryland Department of Health jointly to establish a uniform mental disorder screening procedure for screening inmates; establishing certain requirements for a mental disorder screening test; requiring that each inmate detained or confined in a correctional facility be screened for a mental disorder at a certain time, except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Correctional Facilities - Mental Disorder Screening
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Text - First - Public Safety - Correctional Facilities - Mental Disorder Screening
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM