Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild Venison
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Mathias, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law related to the sale of livestock apply to specified deer; providing that the Maryland Wholesome Meat Act applies to specified deer; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture and the Department of Natural Resources on or before October 1, 2016, to adopt regulations to establish requirements for the processing, inspection, labeling and sale of wild venison in the State; authorizing a person who holds a crop damage permit to hunt deer under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-301, 4-103, 4-107, 4-123.1 )
(   10-404, 10-415 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM