Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner of election for certain members of the Charles County Board of Education by specifying that members be elected from six school board districts and one from the county at-large; requiring the Board of Charles County Commissioners to establish six school board districts in a certain manner; providing for the ballot requirements for a certain election; requiring the State Board of Elections to declare the election of certain candidates; providing for the qualifications of the elected members of the county board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1060
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page