Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner of election for certain members of the Charles County Board of Education by specifying that members be elected from certain county commissioner districts; providing for the ballot requirements for a certain election; requiring the State Board of Elections to declare the election of certain candidates; providing for the qualifications of the elected members of the county board; authorizing the student member of the county board to vote on all matters before the board, with certain exceptions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1060
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-11)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {834630/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (119-11) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Age
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 9:32 AM
Click to return on the top page