Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Service Facilities - Meals for Children
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, King, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the types of beverages that a food service facility may include in the price of specified menu options or meals; and authorizing a food service facility to offer specified beverages to minors for a charge.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM