Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Low Speed Electric Vehicles - Use by Municipalities
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing an exception under certain circumstances for low speed electric vehicles to the vehicle registration requirement; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a permit to a municipality that authorizes the municipality to operate on a highway up to four low speed electric vehicles; authorizing a municipality to apply for a permit; requiring a permit applicant to state certain information; establishing certain operating requirements for a municipal low speed electric vehicle; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Low Speed Electric Vehicles - Use by Municipalities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Low Speed Electric Vehicles - Use by Municipalities
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-130.1, 13-402, 21-104.5, 24-113.4 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:19 PM