Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Financing Authority
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington County Board of Education to seek private financing, not to exceed $10,000,000 as of the date the private financing is secured, to finance specified projects or capital leases; requiring private financing to be authorized by a resolution of the Board and may be secured by a financial instrument by and between the Board and a lender; requiring a resolution to contain specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501, 4-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM