Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the county commissioners of a code home rule county of the Southern Maryland class to establish a Human Relations Commission for the county; specifying the purpose of the Commission is to use its influence to direct the efforts of the community to solving problems that are often the basic reasons for racial tensions and to encourage and ensure equal treatment of all people; making certain provisions of law governing a certain county human relations commission applicable to a Human Relations Commission established under the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page