Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member or an ex officio member of the Workgroup from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Workgroup to obtain certain information and recommendations, meet on a certain schedule, and conduct reviews of certain fire and explosion investigations performed by certain public agencies; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1587
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Investigation Science Advisory Workgroup
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM